Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Martínez Robledo y Robledo

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1779Born
16 Jan 185474.2SelectedBishop of Guadix, Spain
7 Apr 185474.4ConfirmedBishop of Guadix, Spain
9 Jul 185474.7Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
3 Feb 185575.2DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Martínez Robledo y Robledo
Bishop Mariano Martínez Robledo y Robledo (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Granada, Archdiocese of Granada

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,662
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 163, Number 895
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1854, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018