Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Francisco Jiménez del Río

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1736BornOncala
14 Feb 178548.7AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
5 Jun 178549.0Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
18 Dec 179559.5AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
1 Apr 180063.8DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Francisco Jiménez del Río:
Archbishop Juan Francisco Jiménez del Río (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 102, Number 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 23
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 373, and Page 430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016