Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Martinez Palomino y Lopez de Lorena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

Note/Previous Titular See: (abbot/Alcala la Real)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1725Born
19 Dec 178560.0AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
5 Nov 178660.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
8 Mar 178862.2ResignedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
8 Jun 179064.4AppointedAbbot
17 Apr 179973.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

MicroData Summary for Jose Martinez Palomino y Lopez de Lorena
Bishop Jose Martinez Palomino y Lopez de Lorena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValdemoro, Spain

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 163
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 105, Number 543
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018