Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Puñuela Alonso

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1735³BornCantalpino
23 Apr 178751.9AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
15 Jul 178752.2Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
23 Aug 179358.3DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Puñuela Alonso
Bishop Antonio Puñuela Alonso (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 105, Number 545
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016