Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cayetano Peña Granada

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1743BornMadrid
1769¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 179046.5AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
8 Aug 179046.6Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
15 Oct 179248.8DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Peña Granada
Bishop Cayetano Peña Granada (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a priest for 23.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 108, Number 561
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016