Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Fernando José de Echánove y Zaldívar

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona

Note/Previous Titular See: (Abbot/San Ildefonso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1765BornOchandiano
1792²26.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 181853.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
10 Jan 181953.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicosia
13 Mar 182660.7AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
14 Nov 1854³89.4DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Fernando José de Echánove y Zaldívar (VIAF: 88803877)
Archbishop Antonio Fernando José de Echánove y Zaldívar (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 283, and Page 360
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 137, Number 739
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016