Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gil Estéve y Tomás

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1798Born
16 Mar 184849.2SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
3 Jul 184849.5ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
8 Oct 184849.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
15 Apr 185455.3SelectedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
23 Jun 185455.5ConfirmedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
6 Aug 185758.6SelectedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
25 Sep 185758.7ConfirmedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
27 Jul 185859.6DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gil Estéve y Tomás (VIAF: 311585812)
Bishop Gil Estéve y Tomás (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorá, Diocese of Solsona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tarragona, Archdiocese of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 243, and Page 464
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 555
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 156, Number 856
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast