Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Llucià Casadevall i Duran

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1785BornVic
23 Dec 180924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Vic, Spain
16 Mar 184862.3SelectedBishop of Vic, Spain
3 Jul 184862.6ConfirmedBishop of Vic, Spain
15 Oct 184862.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
11 Mar 185266.3DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Llucià Casadevall i Duran:
Bishop Llucià Casadevall i Duran (born , died ) Bishop of Vic

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 589
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 157, Number 857

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013