Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo-Maria Tirabassi

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1801BornRotella
31 Mar 182725.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 184543.7AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
23 Feb 184543.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
2 Jan 186563.6DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardo-Maria Tirabassi:
Bishop Bernardo-Maria Tirabassi (born , died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013