Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Caixal y Estradé

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1803Born
30 Nov 185249.3SelectedBishop of Urgell, Spain
10 Mar 185349.6ConfirmedBishop of Urgell, Spain
5 Jun 185349.9Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
26 Aug 187976.1DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Caixal y Estradé (VIAF: 120286146)
Bishop José Caixal y Estradé (born , died ) Bishop of Urgell

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilosell

  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 575
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 162, Number 890
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017