Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mateo Jaume y Garau

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1811Born
4 Sep 185746.0SelectedBishop of Menorca, Spain
21 Dec 185746.3ConfirmedBishop of Menorca, Spain
18 Apr 185846.6Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
2 Jul 187563.8SelectedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
17 Sep 187564.0ConfirmedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
19 Feb 188674.4DiedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Mateo Jaume y Garau (VIAF: 304911706)
Bishop Mateo Jaume y Garau (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca y Ibiza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLuchmayor, Diocese of Menorca
Ordained BishopCathedral, Barcelona, Diocese of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 360, and Page 387
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 166, Number 911
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017