Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Solís y Fernández

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1849Born
25 May 187223.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 190556.7AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
26 May 190758.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
24 Feb 193181.9DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Solís y Fernández
Bishop Juan José Solís y Fernández (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOviedo

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018