Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justo Rivas Fernández

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1873BornRiotorto
Jun 1900³27.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 192249.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
22 Sep 192249.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Priene
18 Dec 192451.5AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
25 Jul 192552.1Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
16 Jul 193057.1DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Justo Rivas Fernández:
Bishop Justo Rivas Fernández (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013