Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Antonio Castellanos Franco, O.S.A.

Bishop Emeritus of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1935 Born
12 Jul 195924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
27 Jul 197843.4AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
30 Sep 197843.6Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
4 Sep 199156.5ResignedBishop of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Antonio Castellanos Franco
Bishop Nicolás Antonio Castellanos Franco O.S.A. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMansilla del Páramo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast