Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo González Montes

Bishop of Almería


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1946 BornAldeávila
29 Jun 197225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salamanca, Spain
26 May 199750.5AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
5 Jul 199750.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
15 Apr 200255.4AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Adolfo González Montes:
Bishop Adolfo González Montes (born ) Bishop of Almería

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Almería.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,030

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014