Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Rodríguez Gamoneda, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iquitos

Titular Bishop of Gazera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1893BornAlienes, Spain
24 Apr 192127.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
8 May 195561.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru
8 May 195561.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gazera
10 Jul 195561.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gazera
12 Jun 196773.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of Iquitos, Peru
4 Sep 198592.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iquitos, Peru

MicroData Summary for Angel Rodríguez Gamoneda:
Bishop Angel Rodríguez Gamoneda O.S.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iquitos

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013