Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop León Buenaventura de Uriarte Bengoa, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of San Ramón

Titular Bishop of Madaurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1891BornCeanuri, Spain
15 Apr 191726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jul 194049.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ucayali, Peru
10 Jul 194049.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
4 Oct 194049.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madaurus
2 Mar 195665.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Ramón, Peru
19 Jan 197079.0DiedVicar Apostolic of San Ramón, Peru

MicroData Summary for León Buenaventura de Uriarte Bengoa:
Bishop León Buenaventura de Uriarte Bengoa O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of San Ramón

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,418
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013