Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elías Prado Tello

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga

Titular Bishop of Theveste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1910BornAyacucho
29 Dec 193525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
14 Nov 196353.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuzco, Peru
14 Nov 196353.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
19 Jan 196453.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
5 Aug 197261.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
22 Nov 198575.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
14 Feb 200291.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru

MicroData Summary for Elías Prado Tello:
Bishop Elías Prado Tello (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015