Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Godoy

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateEventTitle
2 May 1650AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
21 Jan 1652Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
1 Sep 1659AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
Dec 1659²DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Godoy
Bishop Francisco de Godoy (died Dec 1659) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValdivia

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 199, and Page 348
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018