Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco López Sánchez

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1729BornBenamocarra, Spain
1754¹24.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Dec 178152.3AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
21 Oct 178253.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
2 Mar 179060.6DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco López Sánchez:
Bishop Francisco López Sánchez (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,711
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 99, Number 512
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 31 Dec 2015