Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Matienzo

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1727Born
27 Jun 179668.7AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
19 Mar 179769.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
1802¹74.2DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Matienzo
Bishop Francisco Matienzo (born , died 1802) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Plata

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018