Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasco Jacinto de Contreras y Valverde

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1657SelectedBishop of PopayŠn, Colombia
25 Feb 1658ConfirmedBishop of PopayŠn, Colombia
8 Dec 1658Ordained BishopBishop of PopayŠn, Colombia
7 Jun 1666AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
1668¹DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vasco Jacinto de Contreras y Valverde:
Bishop Vasco Jacinto de Contreras y Valverde Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a bishop for 9.1 years

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 285, and Page 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013