Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Federico Richter Fernandez-Prada, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1922BornHuanta
14 Jul 194624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Apr 197351.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Piura, Peru
12 Apr 197351.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
17 May 197351.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
20 Sep 197553.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
20 Sep 197553.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thucca in Numidia
20 Nov 197957.7SucceededArchbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
23 May 199169.2RetiredArchbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
8 Aug 201189.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru

MicroData Summary for Federico Richter Fernandez-Prada:
Archbishop Federico Richter Fernandez-Prada O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ayacucho o Huamanga

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 8 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015