Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis de Lila y Moreno, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1720BornLima
20 Aug 176443.7AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
20 Apr 176645.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
25 Dec 176848.1DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

MicroData Summary for José Luis de Lila y Moreno:
Bishop José Luis de Lila y Moreno O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,708
  • d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015