Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier de Luna Victoria y Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1695Born
26 Mar 175155.3SelectedBishop of Panamá
17 May 175155.4ConfirmedBishop of Panamá
Oct 1751³55.8Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
13 Mar 175862.2AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
175963.0InstalledBishop of Trujillo, Peru
11 Mar 177781.2DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier de Luna Victoria y Castro
Bishop Francisco Javier de Luna Victoria y Castro (born , died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 326, and Page 419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast