Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo de Arbizu y Ugarte

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1696¹BornCusco
7 Aug 174650.5SelectedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
28 Nov 174650.9ConfirmedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
30 Jul 174751.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
2 Sep 175155.6SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
15 Nov 175155.8ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
20 Oct 175660.8DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
23 May 175761.3AppointedArchbishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Arbizu y Ugarte:
Bishop Bernardo de Arbizu y Ugarte (born 1696, died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 150, and Page 341
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 419
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015