Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Antonio de Barroeta Angel

Deceased

Archbishop of Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1701³BornEscaray
8 Aug 174846.7SelectedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
16 Sep 174846.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
3 Jan 175149.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lima, Peru
19 Dec 175756.1AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
20 Mar 177573.4DiedArchbishop of Granada, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Antonio de Barroeta Angel:
Archbishop Pedro Antonio de Barroeta Angel (born , died ) Archbishop of Granada

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228, and Page 261
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 69, Number 330
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228, and Page 261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 14 Dec 2015