Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Ladrón de Guevara

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1640²BornSigüenza, Spain
6 Jun 168949.4AppointedBishop of Panamá
11 Apr 169959.3AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
15 Sep 170464.7AppointedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
12 Jul 171777.5ResignedBishop of Quito, Ecuador
1718²78.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Diego Ladrón de Guevara:
Bishop Diego Ladrón de Guevara Bishop Emeritus of Quito

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 215, and Page 305
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 326
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 231, Number 1,439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013