Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés García de Zurita

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹BornSeville
10 Feb 164874.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
10 Feb 164874.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Berytus
1649¹75.0SucceededBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
11 Jul 164975.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
4 Apr 165076.2AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
2 Aug 165278.5DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrés García de Zurita:
Bishop Andrés García de Zurita (born 1574, died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,403
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 114, and Page 199
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 178, Number 1,111
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015