Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Javier Miguel Ariz Huarte, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

Titular Bishop of Bapara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1910BornPamplona, Spain
5 Aug 193424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Feb 195241.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru
21 Feb 195241.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bapara
22 May 195241.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bapara
27 May 195948.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru
26 Apr 198069.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
30 Sep 199585.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Javier Miguel Ariz Huarte:
Bishop Javier Miguel Ariz Huarte O.P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lima

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013