Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Theodore Labrador Fraile, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1888Born
190617.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Oct 191425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 May 192637.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Funing [Xiapu], China
18 May 192637.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Fussala
24 Oct 192637.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fussala
11 Apr 194657.4AppointedBishop of Xiapu [Funing], China
13 Jun 194657.5AppointedArchbishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China
6 May 198091.4DiedArchbishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China

MicroData Summary for Theodore Labrador Fraile
Archbishop Theodore Labrador Fraile O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Fuzhou [Foochow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenavista de Valdivia, Spain

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 53.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018