Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Yang Shudao (Yang Su Tao)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Fuzhou [Foochow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1919Born
7 Oct 194728.4Ordained PriestPriest of Fuzhou [Foochow], China
7 Aug 198768.3Ordained BishopBishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China
28 Aug 201091.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Fuzhou [Foochow], China

MicroData Summary for John Yang Shudao (Yang Su Tao)
Archbishop John Yang Shudao (Yang Su Tao) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fuzhou [Foochow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTubao, Liangjiang county
Death PlaceTubao, Liangjiang county

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 27 Dec 2019

Quantcast