Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Lin Jiashan

Archbishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1934 Born
11 May 198146.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 199762.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China
28 Aug 201075.9SucceededArchbishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China
9 Jun 202085.7InstalledArchbishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China

MicroData Summary for Peter Lin Jiashan
Archbishop Peter Lin Jiashan (born ) Archbishop of Fuzhou [Foochow]

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Fuzhou [Foochow].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 84
  • i: CB, 10 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 10 Jun 2020

Quantcast