Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Aguirre Murga, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Foochow [Fuzhou], China

Titular Bishop of Botrys


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1863Born
14 Sep 188320.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Apr 188724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Dec 191148.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
13 Dec 191148.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
16 Jun 191249.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
12 Jun 194178.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Foochow [Fuzhou], China

MicroData Summary for Francisco Aguirre Murga
Bishop Francisco Aguirre Murga O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Foochow [Fuzhou]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEloibar, Diocese of Vitoria, Spain
Ordained BishopBui-chu
Death PlaceFoochow, Vicariate Apostolic of Foochow [Fuzhou]

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 37
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 90
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 May 2020

Quantcast