Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Larrañeta Olleta, O.P.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Maldonado

Titular Bishop of Marazanae Regiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1941 BornVillava, Spain
11 Apr 196524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Apr 197635.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puerto Maldonado, Peru
10 Apr 197635.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae Regiae
20 Jun 197635.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae Regiae
26 Apr 198039.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru
2 Feb 200866.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan José Larrañeta Olleta:
Bishop Juan José Larrañeta Olleta O.P. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Maldonado

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015