Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fortunato Pablo Urcey, O.A.R.

Prelate of Chota, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1947 Born
196416.8ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
19 Jul 196821.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
5 Jul 197124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
15 Oct 200558.5AppointedPrelate of Chota, Peru
12 Dec 200558.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Chota, Peru

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Pablo Urcey
Bishop Fortunato Pablo Urcey O.A.R. (born ) Prelate of Chota

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEstollo, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Chota.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018