Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emiliano Antonio Cisneros Martínez, O.A.R.

Bishop of Chachapoyas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1945 BornAlmazul, Spain
14 Jul 196823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
7 Dec 199348.8AppointedPrelate of Chota, Peru
6 Jan 199448.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Chota, Peru
27 Mar 200257.1AppointedBishop of Chachapoyas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Emiliano Antonio Cisneros Martínez:
Bishop Emiliano Antonio Cisneros Martínez O.A.R. (born ) Bishop of Chachapoyas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chachapoyas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,191
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013