Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carmelo Martínez Lázaro, O.A.R.

Bishop of Cajamarca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1954 BornLuezas, Spain
26 Aug 197824.0ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
19 Jul 198025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
27 Mar 200247.6AppointedPrelate of Chota, Peru
5 May 200247.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Chota, Peru
12 Oct 200450.1AppointedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
19 Dec 200450.3InstalledBishop of Cajamarca, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Carmelo Martínez Lázaro:
Bishop José Carmelo Martínez Lázaro O.A.R. (born ) Bishop of Cajamarca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cajamarca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013