Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco González González

Bishop of Campeche


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1966 BornYahualica
4 Jun 199529.2Ordained PriestPriest of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
14 Feb 200841.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
14 Feb 200841.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
10 Apr 200842.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
13 Dec 201347.7AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
12 Feb 201447.9InstalledBishop of Campeche, México

MicroData Summary for José Francisco González González:
Bishop José Francisco González González (born ) Bishop of Campeche

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campeche.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,725
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2013
  • i: CB, 16 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 16 Jan 2014