Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Valdéz Torres

Bishop of Ensenada, Baja California Norte, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1959 Born
9 Feb 198525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Zamora, Michoacán, México
21 May 201353.5AppointedBishop of Ensenada, Baja California Norte, México
31 Jul 201353.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ensenada, Baja California Norte, México

MicroData Summary for Rafael Valdéz Torres
Bishop Rafael Valdéz Torres (born ) Bishop of Ensenada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago Tangamandapio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ensenada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2013
  • ob: CB, 23 May 2013
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jul 2013
  • c2+: CB, 2 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,842

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018