Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Miguel Cantón Marín

Deceased

Bishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1938Born
29 Jun 196425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Yucatán, México
30 Mar 198445.4AppointedBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
6 Jun 198445.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
10 May 199051.5DiedBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Miguel Cantón Marín
Bishop Luis Miguel Cantón Marín (born , died ) Bishop of Tapachula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProgreso

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018