Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo González González

Bishop of Tapachula, Chiapas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1950 BornAbasolo
23 Nov 197525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
18 Mar 199948.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
18 Mar 199948.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncaria
19 May 199948.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voncaria
9 Jun 200554.6AppointedBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo González González:
Bishop Leopoldo González González (born ) Bishop of Tapachula

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tapachula.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,556

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013