Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rogelio Cabrera López

Archbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1951 BornSanta Catalina
17 Nov 197827.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Apr 199645.2AppointedBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
30 May 199645.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
16 Jul 200150.4AppointedBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
11 Sep 200453.6AppointedBishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
25 Nov 200655.8AppointedArchbishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
3 Oct 201261.6AppointedArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
5 Dec 201261.8InstalledArchbishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for Rogelio Cabrera López:
Archbishop Rogelio Cabrera López (born ) Archbishop of Monterrey

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Monterrey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,755
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2012
  • i: CB, 4 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015