Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Mendoza Corzo

Auxiliary Bishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México

Titular Bishop of Lamiggiga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1960 Born
7 Feb 198828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
23 Mar 200747.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez, Chiapas, México
23 Mar 200747.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamiggiga
8 May 200747.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamiggiga

MicroData Summary for José Luis Mendoza Corzo
Bishop José Luis Mendoza Corzo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tuxtla Gutiérrez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCristóbal Obregón

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Tuxtla Gutiérrez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,418
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast