Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Garza Madero

Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

Titular Bishop of Tetci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1952 Born
8 Dec 197826.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
8 Sep 197927.6Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
17 Oct 202068.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
17 Oct 202068.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tetci
17 Dec 202068.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tetci

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Garza Madero
Bishop José Manuel Garza Madero (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Monterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Monterrey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Nov 2020
  • 2t92: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2020, Number 19
  • c34: CB, 17 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Dec 2020

Quantcast