Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Lizares Estrada

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1934 Born
19 Dec 195925.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 198045.7AppointedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
29 Apr 198045.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
31 Jan 198752.6ResignedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
25 Mar 198752.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
21 Dec 200975.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

MicroData Summary for José Lizares Estrada
Bishop José Lizares Estrada (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Monterrey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTapalpa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Monterrey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast