Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Garza Miranda, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

Titular Bishop of Magnetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1971 Born
14 Aug 199321.8EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Aug 199422.8First VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
19 Aug 200028.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
14 Dec 200231.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Oct 202048.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
17 Oct 202048.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Magnetum
17 Dec 202049.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magnetum

MicroData Summary for César Garza Miranda
Bishop César Garza Miranda O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Nicolás de los Garza, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Monterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Monterrey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Nov 2020
  • c34: CB, 17 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Dec 2020

Quantcast