Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Arcq Guzmán

Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1966 Born
15 Aug 199629.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
15 Aug 199730.8Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
17 Oct 202054.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
17 Oct 202054.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
17 Dec 202054.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Arcq Guzmán
Bishop Juan Carlos Arcq Guzmán (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Basilica, Monterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Monterrey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Nov 2020
  • c34: CB, 17 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Dec 2020

Quantcast