Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heriberto Cavazos Pérez

Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México

Titular Bishop of Narona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1948 Born
17 Jan 197627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
31 Oct 201667.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Monterrey, Nuevo León, México
31 Oct 201667.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Narona
11 Jan 201768.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Narona

MicroData Summary for Heriberto Cavazos Pérez
Bishop Heriberto Cavazos Pérez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Monterrey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza de Allende
Ordained BishopBasílica de Guadalupe, Monterrey, Archdiocese of Monterrey, Nuevo León

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Monterrey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 5 Nov 2016
  • ob: CB, 13 Nov 2016
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jan 2017