Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joel Ocampo Gorostieta

Bishop-Elect of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1963 Born
15 Apr 198925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
2 Apr 201955.6AppointedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
9 Jul 201955.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México

MicroData Summary for Joel Ocampo Gorostieta
Father Joel Ocampo Gorostieta (born ) Bishop-Elect of Ciudad Altamirano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelchor Ocampo (Paso de Tierra Caliente)
Ordained BishopAuditorio, La Anunciación, Mayor Seminario, Ciudad Altamirano, Diocese of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Ciudad Altamirano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Apr 2019
  • c1/bp: CB, 2 Apr 2019
  • ob: CB, 7 Apr 2019
  • c2+: CB, 15 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 17 May 2019

Quantcast